Conover v. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Conover
Defendant: Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Case Number: 4:2012cv06480
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
March 27, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/9/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/27/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by NOON on 4/17/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/11/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup [granting 14 Motion to Dismiss ].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/2/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conover v. Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.