In re Howrey LLP et al

Miscellaneous: Dennis Montali and U.S. Bankruptcy Court, No. District of CA (San Francisco)
Creditor: Give Something Back, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Ad Hoc Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Kent Daniels and Associates, Inc., Jan Brown & Associates, Matura Farrington Staffing Services, Inc., L.A. Best Photocopies, Inc., Western Messenger Service, Inc. and Advanced Discovery LLC
Appellant: Howrey LLP and Howrey Claims, LLC
Trustee: Allan Diamond and Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Appellee: Allan B. Diamond
Case Number: 4:2013cv00449
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 13 Stipulation; terminating 15 STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE PROCEEDINGS AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
May 29, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/29/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 29, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: C-13-1889-SBA; C-13-981-SBA and C-13-449-SBA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 05/23/2013. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
June 24, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule filed by Howrey Claims, LLC, Allan Diamond. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/24/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
August 8, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CONSOLIDATED BANKRUPTCY APPEALS. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/8/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
March 4, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING 3 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed by U.S. Bankruptcy Court, No. District of CA (San Francisco), STRIKING 4 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/4/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Howrey LLP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Dennis Montali
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: U.S. Bankruptcy Court, No. District of CA (San Francisco)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Give Something Back, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Maureen A. Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Bradford Frost Englander
Represented By: Martin Fletcher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Ad Hoc Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Kent Daniels and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: William McGrane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Jan Brown & Associates
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Maureen A. Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Matura Farrington Staffing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Wondie Russell
Represented By: William McGrane
Represented By: Maureen A. Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: L.A. Best Photocopies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Maureen A. Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Western Messenger Service, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: William McGrane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Advanced Discovery LLC
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Maureen A. Harrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Howrey LLP
Represented By: Joel M. Walker
Represented By: Dylan G. Trache
Represented By: Craig Mitchell Prim
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Posin
Represented By: Aron Mark Oliner
Represented By: Valerie Morrison
Represented By: Alexander M. Laughlin
Represented By: James P. Hollihan
Represented By: Eve Klein
Represented By: Geoffrey Arnold Heaton
Represented By: H. Jason Gold
Represented By: Robert Anthony Franklin
Represented By: Jenny L. Fountain
Represented By: Joel Dennis Adler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Howrey Claims, LLC
Represented By: Hagop T. Bedoyan
Represented By: Christian Douglas Jinkerson
Represented By: William McGrane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Allan Diamond
Represented By: Stephen Todd Loden
Represented By: Chris David Kuhner, Esq.
Represented By: Andrea L. Kim
Represented By: Jon Maxwell Beatty
Represented By: Eric D. Madden
Represented By: Christopher R. Murray
Represented By: Eric Albert Nyberg, Esq.
Represented By: Howard D. Ressler
Represented By: Charles M. Rubio
Represented By: Jason M. Rudd
Represented By: Andrew Baxter Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Represented By: Minnie Loo
Represented By: Donna Shizuko Tamanaha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Allan B. Diamond
Represented By: John Benjamin King
Represented By: Chris David Kuhner, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen Todd Loden
Represented By: Eric Albert Nyberg, Esq.
Represented By: Jason M. Rudd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]