Boschetti v. O'Blenis

Plaintiff: Paul Boschetti
Defendant: Daniel O'Blenis
Case Number: 4:2013cv00628
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING 2 IFP AND 6 MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS 11 MOTION TO SEAL. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
June 19, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of referral to determine if case is related to Boschetti v. O'Blenis, C-13-2706 MEJ. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/19/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
July 22, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ***DISREGARD*** RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013) Modified on 7/22/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ( 8 in 4:13-cv-02706-CW) REMANDING CASE & ( 10 in 4:13-cv-02706-CW) GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/14/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PRE-FILING ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/14/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boschetti v. O'Blenis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Boschetti
Represented By: John Phillip Zanghi
Represented By: Curtis F. Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel O'Blenis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.