SoftVault Systems, Inc. v. Juniper Network, Inc.

Plaintiff: SoftVault Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Juniper Network, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00752
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER (correcting case number from 13-cv-00750 to 13-cv-00754). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/13/13. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
July 18, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 MOTION to Relate Case Motion to Consider Whether Cases Are Related filed by SoftVault Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 18, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
February 12, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 2/12/2014. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
March 20, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 3/20/2014. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SoftVault Systems, Inc. v. Juniper Network, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SoftVault Systems, Inc.
Represented By: P.J. Benedict O'Mahoney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Network, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Saunders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]