Duenas et al v. Freitas et al

Plaintiff: Harold Goldman and Gerard Duenas
Defendant: Steven Freitas, Kathryn Straley, Sonoma County Sheriff's Department, Deutsche Bank National Company, Michael S. and Mary C. Baskauskas
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00836
Filed: February 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 16 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
May 30, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank National Company. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/29/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
June 7, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING 27 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Gerard Duenas. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/7/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 28, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
July 11, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 37 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
February 26, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Wilken for Judge Armstrong denying 3 Motion for TRO (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Duenas et al v. Freitas et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Duenas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Freitas
Represented By: Anne L. Keck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Straley
Represented By: Anne L. Keck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Anne L. Keck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary C. Baskauskas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]