Eli Lilly and Company et al v. Genentech, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Imclone Systems LLC and Eli Lilly and Company
Defendant: City of Hope and Genentech, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00919
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 Stipulation, filed by Genentech, Inc., City of Hope, Eli Lilly and Company, Imclone Systems LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/29/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
May 2, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 18 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 22, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 19 MOTION to Change Venue, 24 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 23 . Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2013 is CONTINUED to 7/23/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/22/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
July 22, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on July 22, 2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
August 13, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 19 Motion to Transfer case to U.S. District Court for Central District of California ; denying without prejudice 38 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; terminating 47 Stipulation selecting Mediation; denying without prejudice 24 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eli Lilly and Company et al v. Genentech, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imclone Systems LLC
Represented By: Michael John Lyons
Represented By: Daniel Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Francis Carr
Represented By: Walter Scott Tester
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Walter Scott Tester
Represented By: Michael John Lyons
Represented By: Daniel Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Francis Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hope
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]