Fulghum v. Colvin

Plaintiff: John M. Fulghum
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2013cv00978
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2013.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on June 6, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 11, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on June 11, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on June 11, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
August 5, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulghum v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Fulghum
Represented By: Meghan Corman Pluimer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Jacob Mikow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]