Hooke v. Foss Maritime Company

Defendant: Foss Maritime Company
Plaintiff: Thomas Hooke
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00994
Filed: March 5, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [Reassigned Case] Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/28/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
February 25, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re 29 Joint Letter. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 25, 2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
April 10, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re 29 33 35 . Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 10, 2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
May 13, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re 39 . Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 13, 2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hooke v. Foss Maritime Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foss Maritime Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hooke
Represented By: John R. Hillsman
Represented By: Abraham Feinstein-Hillsman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]