Pierce et al v. Cantil-Sakauye et al

Plaintiff: Michele Fotinos, Kerry Hicks, Andrew Karres, Ronald Pierce, Archibald Cunningham, Nicole Ann Ray, Amil Hiramenk, Lisa Hunt-Nocera and Richard Rifkin
Defendant: Cantil-Sakauye and Steven Jahr
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01295
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
June 11, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE ORDER OF REFERRAL; JUNE 14, 2013 HEARING VACATED (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 19, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 11 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR REPLY AND HEARING ON 19 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 19, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
July 18, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEMAND RE LOCAL RULE 3-15. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/18/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 19, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 42 RENEWED DEMAND THAT JUDGE WHITE COMPLY WITH PLAIN LANGUAGE OF LOCAL RULE 3-15 AND REFER THE ISSUE OF DISQUALIFICATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 144 TO ANOTHER JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
August 13, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pierce et al v. Cantil-Sakauye et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Fotinos
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Hicks
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Karres
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Pierce
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archibald Cunningham
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ann Ray
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amil Hiramenk
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hunt-Nocera
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rifkin
Represented By: Archibald Robert Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantil-Sakauye
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jahr
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]