Nantambu v. Office Depot

Plaintiff: Bomani Nantambu
Defendant: Office Depot
Case Number: 4:2013cv01456
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
November 19, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Continue ADR Deadline And To Allow Plaintiff's Deposition Prior to ADR) filed by Office Depot Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/19/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
March 10, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Complaint filed by Bomani Nantambu. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
July 30, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 31 Stipulation filed by Bomani Nantambu. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nantambu v. Office Depot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bomani Nantambu
Represented By: Stephen F. Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot
Represented By: Alexa L Woerner
Represented By: Michael E. Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]