Davis et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Plaintiff: Hezekiah Williams, Sr., David J. Clark, Jr., Edna A. Brown, Ronald Godley, Ronald P. Rico, Gloria Wilson, Gail M. Slagle, Kenneth W. Kelly, Bobby Baker, Shirley A. Taylor, James Burton, Duane P. Ford, Cynthia E. Ford, Thomas S. Slagle, Karen Dwyer, Grace Pedrick, Debra L. Clark, Alex W. Asble, Dorothy Williams, Lieselotte I. Mclain, Ezra K. Cassidy, Debra A. Person, Harvey C. Spencer, Ann Spencer, Lamar W. Butler, Jane L. Butler, Sandra Pilarski, Richard A. Wilson, Nina F. Oliver, Ronald D. Taylor, David W. Weaver, Edmund B. Dwyer, Vicki Deloach, Elizabeth B. Jernigan, Marilyn Ladson, John Giardina, Ronald T. Boulris, Patricia Bouris, Anna J. Tingley, Edna G. Wilson, Jessie J. Oliver, Thomas A. Williams, Carol A. Lafleur, Judy Godley, Mary O. Burton, George W. Davis, Jasper Person, George V. Lockwood, Jr., Mary D. York, Richard J. Bennett, Wayne A. Garner, Irene E. Williams, Mary E. Weaver, John Deloach, Leonard B. Cantrell, Henry Deloatch, Callie H. Deloatch, Francis J. Mitchell, Lillian Mitchell, John K. Degolier, Loretta J. Degolier, Geneva K. Bellinger, Larry D. Bellinger, Karl Teske, Norman H. Yeomans, Florence A. Ortiz, Gilbert Ortiz, Patsy S. Burch, Nancy M. Glenn, Robert J. Schulze and Mary Lou Schulze
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 4:2013cv01462
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 4/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
July 9, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 7/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of New Jersey. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hezekiah Williams, Sr.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna A. Brown
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Godley
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald P. Rico
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Wilson
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail M. Slagle
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Kelly
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Baker
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Taylor
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burton
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane P. Ford
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia E. Ford
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S. Slagle
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Dwyer
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Pedrick
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L. Clark
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex W. Asble
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Williams
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieselotte I. Mclain
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezra K. Cassidy
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra A. Person
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey C. Spencer
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Spencer
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar W. Butler
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane L. Butler
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Pilarski
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Wilson
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina F. Oliver
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald D. Taylor
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Weaver
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund B. Dwyer
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Deloach
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth B. Jernigan
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Ladson
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Giardina
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald T. Boulris
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Bouris
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna J. Tingley
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna G. Wilson
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie J. Oliver
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Williams
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. Lafleur
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Godley
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary O. Burton
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Davis
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper Person
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George V. Lockwood, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary D. York
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Bennett
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne A. Garner
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene E. Williams
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Weaver
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Deloach
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard B. Cantrell
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Deloatch
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callie H. Deloatch
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis J. Mitchell
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Mitchell
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K. Degolier
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta J. Degolier
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva K. Bellinger
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Bellinger
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Teske
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman H. Yeomans
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence A. Ortiz
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Ortiz
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy S. Burch
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy M. Glenn
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Schulze
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Schulze
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]