Willis v. Donahoe et al

Plaintiff: Lovetta Willis
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe and John E. Potter
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01562
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/15/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 19, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss; with leave to amend. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss scheduled for August 20, 2013 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
November 14, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/14/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 26, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 25 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
January 23, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 37 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Court VACATES the hearing set for February 11, 2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Willis v. Donahoe et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovetta Willis
Represented By: Michael C. Cohen, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Potter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]