Bibbs v. Sayre et al

Defendant: Nancy W. Adam, Michael C. Sayre and Terry Rogde
Plaintiff: Martin J. Bibbs
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01570
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Del Norte
Referring Judge: PSLC ECK
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 9 MOTION TO SCREEN COMPLAINT; BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON COGNIZABLE CLAIMS AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013) Modified on 9/24/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING ALL PARTIES TONOTIFY COURT OF CONSENT ORDECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFOREUNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Notice, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
November 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Disposotive Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
January 21, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 23 MOTION TO SCREEN COMPLAINT AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
February 3, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS 27 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
April 8, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 40 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS. Replies due by 5/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
May 27, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 35 , 45 ) MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO CONVERT RULE 12(B) MOTION INTO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
August 19, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 55 Motion Joint Submission Regarding Clarification of Injunction [re] 294 MOTION for Clarification of Timing of Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bibbs v. Sayre et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy W. Adam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Sayre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Rogde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Bibbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]