Subramani v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Karthik Subramani
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Fidelity National Title Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv01605
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadlines as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Responses due by 9/5/2013. Replies due by 9/12/2013. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/23/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
October 31, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
November 4, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PLEADING SCHEDULING ORDER re 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on November 1, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
January 28, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 36 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
May 30, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Discovery due by 12/19/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.Jury Trial set for 2/23/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti for an estimated 4-6 days. Jury Selection set for 2/23/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/30/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
December 3, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 55 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear 53 and 54 MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 12/9/2014. Replies due by 12/11/2014. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 18, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 53 Motion to Compel; granting 54 Motion to Compel (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
January 2, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 01/02/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
March 13, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 18, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 65 Motion for Sanctions; denying 66 Motion for Sanctions (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Subramani v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karthik Subramani
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]