Stahl Law Firm et al v. Judicate West et al

Defendant: Vincent P. Difiglia and Judicate West
Plaintiff: Stahl Law Firm and Norbert Stahl
Case Number: 4:2013cv01668
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PRO TEM REPORTER TO PRODUCE TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/27/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
September 12, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Case for Lack of Standing. Amended complaint, if any, due by 10/10/13. Motions terminated: 33 MOTION to Dismiss and 35 MOTION to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/12/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
November 27, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 60 61 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Standing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/27/13. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
January 10, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Clarification RE 67 Defendant Di Figlia's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/10/14. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 27, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying Defendant Di Figlia's 67 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/14. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stahl Law Firm et al v. Judicate West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent P. Difiglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judicate West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stahl Law Firm
Represented By: Norbert Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norbert Stahl
Represented By: Norbert Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.