Marotz v. City of San Francisco et al

Defendant: SF Police Dept., SF Sheriff Dept, City of San Francisco, George Suhr, Robert O'Sullivan, Mike Hennessy and Ellen Brin
Plaintiff: William Leon Marotz
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01677
Filed: April 12, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2014 101 Featured Case ORDER TAKING MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 92 UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/05/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 17, 2014 103 Featured Case Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 92 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
July 8, 2014 108 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE APPELLATE MATTERS IN APPELLATE COURT. Motions terminated: 107 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by William Leon Marotz.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/08/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 30, 2014 112 Featured Case ORDER NOT RELATING CASES: Cases C-13-1677-DMR Marotz v. City of San Francisco, et al and C-14-2958-NC Marotz v. City and County of San Francisco, et al are NOT RELATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/30/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
October 8, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/08/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 32 AND VACATING OCTOBER 31, 2013 HEARING DATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/23/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AGAINST CERTAIN DEFENDANTS FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY SERVE. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/25/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
December 18, 2013 49 Featured Case Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 40 AND EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/18/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
January 16, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER. Counsel for the City shall inform the court by January 24, 2014 whether (1) counsel for the City will also be representing the other Defendants, and (2) if so, whether those Defendants wish to rest on arguments presented on their behalf by the City in its motion to dismiss, or intend to file a separate motion to dismiss or responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/16/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER TAKING MOTIONS TO DISMISS 58 59 UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/18/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS 26 58 59 ; DENYING MOTION TO RESCIND CONSENT 70 ; AND DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 71 . Motions terminated: 70 26 71 59 58 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/18/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marotz v. City of San Francisco et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Police Dept.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Sheriff Dept
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco
Represented By: James F. Hannawalt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Suhr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert O'Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hennessy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Brin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Leon Marotz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]