Maaco Franchising, Inc. v. Fitzgerald et al

Defendant: Kevin E. Fitzgerald, Dana G. Fitgerald and Economy Auto Painting and Bodywork, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maaco Franchising, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01683
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/08/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
January 15, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCESTATEMENT. By no later than 12 p.m. on January 17, 2014, the parties shall file a supplemental case management conference statement giving a status update on the parties' efforts to engage in s ettlement conversations and/or alternative dispute resolution, including whether the parties have met with the assigned panel mediator Michael Timpane, and if not, whether the mediation has been scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/15/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 22, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The court having been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall cert ify to this court, within 30 days, with proof of service of a copy thereon to opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this case shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. All further dates are vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/22/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
August 12, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/12/2014. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Maaco Franchising, Inc. v. Fitzgerald et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin E. Fitzgerald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana G. Fitgerald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Auto Painting and Bodywork, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maaco Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence James Hilton
Represented By: Jennifer Sun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]