Bennett v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Robert N. Bennett
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and NDEX West, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv01693
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/25/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
May 30, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Motions terminated: 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/30/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
July 16, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Well Fargo's 29 Motion to Appear Telephonically on July 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/16/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
August 2, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney September Joy Katje terminated.(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 9, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this order to file a second amneded complaint to amend his third cause of action. All other claims are dismissed with prejudice.(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
September 20, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF HAS NOT FILED HIS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2013.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/20/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert N. Bennett
Represented By: September Joy Katje
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Adam Frederick Summerfield
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Represented By: Masumi Jagdish Patel
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]