Neighborhood Assistance Corporation of America v. National Media Connection, LLC et al

Defendant: National Media Connection, LLC, The National Mortgage Help Center, LLC and Matthew S. Goldreich
Plaintiff: Neighborhood Assistance Corporation of America
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01698
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 STIPULATION re Reponse Deadline filed by Matthew S. Goldreich, et al. Responsive pleading extended from 5/28/2013 to 6/18/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/29/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
June 18, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 10 Stipulation, 14 Order, Terminate Motions, 11 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Matthew S. Goldreich, National Media Connection, LLC, The National Mortgage Help Center, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/30/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/13/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
August 27, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Response Deadline and CMC filed by Neighborhood Assistance Corporation of America. Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/11/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/27/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Neighborhood Assistance Corporation of America v. National Media Connection, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Media Connection, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Mortgage Help Center, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S. Goldreich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neighborhood Assistance Corporation of America
Represented By: Margaret Alexandra Ziemianek
Represented By: Christopher Casey John McNamara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]