Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Wireless International LLC et al

Defendant: Wireless International LLC and Aliya Abbas Tabatabayee
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2013cv01721
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The July 19, 2013 Case Management Conference is continued to October 4, 2013. All associated dates are continued accordingly. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
September 18, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 18, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
October 23, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Wireless International LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wireless International LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliya Abbas Tabatabayee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Annie S. Wang
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]