Transfresh Corporation v. Ganzerla & Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: Transfresh Corporation
Defendant: Ganzerla & Associates, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01730
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/26/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 29, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 19 Notice (Other) filed by Ganzerla & Associates, Inc., for Jeremy Johnson to appear by phone at 2:00 PM on 4/30/13 for the TRO hearing. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/29/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 29, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Letter filed by Transfresh Corporation for Corporate Counsel Linda Ipong and TransFresh's VP Rich MacLeod to appear by phone on 4/30/13 at 2:00 PM for the TRO hearing. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/29/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
May 6, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Case Should not Dismissed. Show Cause Responses due by 5/17/2013. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 6, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 31, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 29 Motion to Dismiss, staying case pending arbitration and vacating June 28, 2013 motion hearing (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Transfresh Corporation v. Ganzerla & Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transfresh Corporation
Represented By: Michael Dudley Rounds
Represented By: E Lynn Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ganzerla & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]