Great Dynasty International Financial Holdings Limited v. Li et al

Defendant: Zhiyan Li, Pacific Bepure Industry, Inc. and Haiting Li
Plaintiff: Great Dynasty International Financial Holdings Limited
Case Number: 4:2013cv01734
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Hon. Thelton E. Henderson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/25/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
July 10, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 7/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
September 9, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' WAIVER OF THE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CORRESPONDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Zhiyan Li, Pacific Bepure Industry, Inc., Haiting Li. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
July 10, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE 11 INQUIRY AND GRANTING SANCTIONS UNDER THE COURT'S INHERENT AUTHORITY re 51 MOTION for Sanctions Under the PSLRA, or in the Alternative, Under the Court's Inherent Authority fil ed by Zhiyan Li, Pacific Bepure Industry, Inc., Haiting Li. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/14. Defendants' supplemental brief due 7/31/14. Plaintiff's response due 8/14/14. Motion hearing set for 8/28/14 at 1:30 p.m. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
August 4, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER NOTIFYING COURT OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUESTING THAT AUGUST 28, 2014 HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE BE TERMINATED filed by Zhiyan Li. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
April 24, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Dynasty International Financial Holdings Limited v. Li et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhiyan Li
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Bepure Industry, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haiting Li
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Dynasty International Financial Holdings Limited
Represented By: John F. Kloecker
Represented By: Sally Weiss Mimms
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]