Ward et al v. Pickett et al

Defendant: Penny Jane Pickett, Bobbie White, Gregory Alan Pickett, Erin Rothfuss and Wachovia National Bank
Plaintiff: Linda S. Ward and Charles E. Ward
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01735
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/30/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
June 12, 2013 27 Featured Case Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu . The previously scheduled hearing dates for the Wells Fargo Motion to Dismiss 8 and the Rothfuss Motion to Dismiss 16 are VACATED. A hearing on both motions is set for 11:00 a.m. on July 18, 20 13. Any response to the Wells Fargo Motion to Dismiss is due on June 13, 2013, and any reply is due on June 21, 2013. The briefing schedule for the Rothfuss Motion to Dismiss is unchanged. The Order to Show Cause 15 is discharged.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
July 2, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER. The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for July 17, 2013 has been CONTINUED to July 18, 2013 at 11 a.m. The Case Management Statement is due no later than July 11, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/02/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 5, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARINGS.The previously scheduled hearing dates for the motions to dismiss 8 16 30 are VACATED. A hearing on all three motions to dismiss is set for 11:00 a.m. on August 8, 2013. The briefing schedules for all of the motions to dismiss remain unchanged. The Case Management Conference has been CONTINUED to 11:00 a.m. on August 8, 2013. The Case Management Statement is due no later than August 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/05/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
October 3, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss; granting 16 Erin Rothfuss' Motion to Dismiss; Granting in Part 30 Defendants Picketts and Bobbie White's Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 46 Motion to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must file an amended complaint by October 17, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/3/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 21, 2013 65 Featured Case ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 62 . The court has already granted Plaintiffs leave to amend certain claims. See Docket No. 59 . The motion is therefore denied as moot with respect to the request t o amend the claims. The parties are ordered to meet and confer as to whether there are any objections to Plaintiffs adding Mike Pickett as a party defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/21/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 23, 2013 68 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING re 66 Letter filed by Penny Jane Pickett to excuse her appearance at the settlement conference on 11/7/13 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/23/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 28, 2013 72 Featured Case Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 62 Motion to Amend complaint to add Mike Pickett as defendant.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
January 2, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER TAKING MOTION TO DISMISS QUIET TITLE CLAIM 78 UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The court finds that the motion 78 is appropriate for resolution without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, the January 9, 2014 hearing on the motion is hereby VACATED. The court will issue a written order on the motion. The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for January 9, 2014 has been CONTINUED to February 5, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/02/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 14, 2014 86 Featured Case Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 78 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ward et al v. Pickett et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Jane Pickett
Represented By: Ann-Catherine Padian
Represented By: Anthony Paul Schoenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie White
Represented By: Ann-Catherine Padian
Represented By: Anthony Paul Schoenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Alan Pickett
Represented By: Ann-Catherine Padian
Represented By: Anthony Paul Schoenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Rothfuss
Represented By: George Charles Nierlich, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia National Bank
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S. Ward
Represented By: Allen J. Baden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Ward
Represented By: Allen J. Baden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]