Neilsen v. Colvin

Plaintiff: James Neilsen
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01737
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/6/2013. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
October 31, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on October 31, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
May 13, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees, with directions.(njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 14, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 Declaration in Support filed by James Neilsen, 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by James Neilsen, 33 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on May 14, 2014. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
August 6, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO INFORM COURT WHETHER THEY CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/6/2013. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Neilsen v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Neilsen
Represented By: Tom F. Weathered
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]