Belluomini et al v. CitiGroup, Inc. et al

Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Victoria Pastry Co., Inc., Susan Flaherty, Stella Pastry Cafe and Dino Belluomini
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01743
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 14 Citigroup's Motion to Dismiss and granting 18 Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 30, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Request for Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference filed by CitiGroup, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2013. Case Management Conference reset for 10/18/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/29/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
October 4, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 STIPULATION for Request for Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference filed by CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A.. Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/22/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 16, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 38 Motion to Dismiss; granting 40 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 16, 2013 49 Featured Case JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/16/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Belluomini et al v. CitiGroup, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Casnocha
Represented By: Julie L. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Represented By: Mark Ian Wraight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Represented By: Mark Ian Wraight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Pastry Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jason Austin Joseph Lundberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Flaherty
Represented By: Jason Austin Joseph Lundberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Pastry Cafe
Represented By: Jason Austin Joseph Lundberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino Belluomini
Represented By: Jason Austin Joseph Lundberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]