Nguyen v. City of Union City et al

Plaintiff: Tien Van Nguyen
Defendant: City of Union City, Brian Baumgartner, Manny Leon, Joseph Cota, Daniel Dejong and Jeffrey Steward
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01753
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 12 Featured Case Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
July 5, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/05/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 25, 2013 23 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action Battery and Vacating Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss set on 9/26/2013 11:00 AM re 19 Renotice motion hearing, filed by City of Union City, Jeffrey Stewa rd, Daniel Dejong, Brian Baumgartner, Joseph Cota, 18 MOTION to Dismiss Second Cause of Action of Pltf's Second Amended Complaint (FRCP12(b)(6) filed by City of Union City, Jeffrey Steward, Daniel Dejong, Brian Baumgartner, J oseph Cota, Motions terminated: 18 MOTION to Dismiss Second Cause of Action of Pltf's Second Amended Complaint (FRCP12(b)(6) filed by City of Union City, Jeffrey Steward, Daniel Dejong, Brian Baumgartner, Joseph Cota, 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss 2nd Cause of Action filed by Tien Van Nguyen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/25/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
November 7, 2013 28 Featured Case Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 26 Stipulation. Theparties are ordered to revise the proposed Protective Order to comply with the procedures in this court's Standing Order re Discovery, including modifying Section 6.3 to track the procedures in the Standing Order, by no later than November 13, 2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for November 13, 2013 has been CONTINUED to January 15, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. The Case Management Statement is due no later than January 8, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/07/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 18, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/18/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
April 11, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 37 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/11/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nguyen v. City of Union City et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tien Van Nguyen
Represented By: James Michael Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Union City
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Baumgartner
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny Leon
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cota
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Dejong
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Steward
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]