Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Spectrum Painting & Decorating, Inc.. et al

Defendant: Spectrum Painting & Decorating, Inc.. and David Min Hang Chan
Plaintiff: District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Chris Christopherson, Marian Bourboulis, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees, John Maggiore, District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees and Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01782
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 MOTION to Continue - Request to Continue Case Management Conference . Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/22/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
October 22, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER Granting 21 MOTION to Continue - REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PLAINTIFFS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/22/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
December 11, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice, but REFERRING Defendants to the federal pro bono project and staying proceedings pending appointment of counsel. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tmi, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER re 25 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on December 13, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
February 24, 2014 33 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing on Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION to Set Aside Default. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/24/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
April 7, 2014 36 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing as to 28 MOTION to Set Aside Default. Responses due by 5/9/2017. Replies due by 5/16/2014. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/07/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
May 12, 2014 39 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing and Deadlines. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION to Set Aside Default. Responses due by 6/6/2014. Replies due by 6/13/2014. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/12/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
June 6, 2014 43 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing as to 28 MOTION to Set Aside Default. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/06/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
August 22, 2014 48 Featured Case WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Spectrum Painting & Decorating, Inc., aka Spectrum Painting in the amount of $100,424.17. Re 47 Declaration (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees et al v. Spectrum Painting & Decorating, Inc.. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Painting & Decorating, Inc..
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Min Hang Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christopherson
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Bourboulis
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Apprentice and Journeyman Training Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Painters and Tapers Pension Trust Fund, and its Joint Board of Trustees
Represented By: Shivani Nanda
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]