Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Cindy Nelson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2013cv01872
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/14/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/24/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Submission 34 as Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's opposition or counter-motion due by 4/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/04/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]