Patel et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al

Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Rajendra G. Patel and Sangita R. Patel
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01874
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on June 6, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 7 Motion to Dismiss (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
October 17, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 request by Citi Mortgage and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems to appear telephonically at October 22, 2013 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on October 17, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 25, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Plaintiffs' request to appear telephonically at case management conference. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on October 25, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
November 6, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/13/2013 at 5:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on November 6, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
December 12, 2013 46 Featured Case Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 28 Motion to Dismiss.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS AGAINST U.S. BANK, N.A.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on December 12, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
May 20, 2014 57 Featured Case NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Settlement Conference set for 7/10/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
June 19, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER Excusing Attendance at Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Patel et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Shakibi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Van Zandt
Represented By: Peter James VanZandt
Represented By: Claudia Lee Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Van Zandt
Represented By: Peter James VanZandt
Represented By: Claudia Lee Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajendra G. Patel
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Represented By: Megan Dailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sangita R. Patel
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Represented By: Megan Dailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]