Brown v. Donahoe

Plaintiff: Frederick Ethan Brown
Defendant: Patrick Donahoe
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01906
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 MOTION to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference and Case Management Conference filed by Patrick Donahoe. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on October 3, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sis, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO FEBRUARY 11, 2014.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on December 4, 2013. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
January 6, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FOR MARCH 12, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2014: # 1 PROOF OF SERVICE) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Donahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Ethan Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Donahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]