ERTEC Environmental Systems v. RiverValley EcoServices Inc

Plaintiff: ERTEC Environmental Systems
Defendant: RiverValley EcoServices Inc
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01907
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing 8/15/2013 hearing on 10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by ERTEC Environmental Systems until 9/19/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Further information must b e provided by Plaintiff by 8/27/2013. 9/17/2013 Case Management Conference is also continued until 10/15/2013 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2013. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/13/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
October 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/11/2013. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/1/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 17, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Adopting 18 Report and Recommendation and Granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ERTEC Environmental Systems v. RiverValley EcoServices Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERTEC Environmental Systems
Represented By: William C. Acevedo
Represented By: Richard Anthony Lyons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RiverValley EcoServices Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]