Richardson v. Fluor Corporation

Plaintiff: Timothy Ray Richardson
Defendant: Fluor Corporation and Fluor Maintenance Services, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01908
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
 
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/26/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
February 5, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/5/2014. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 40 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 40 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND.( 48 Order on Motion for Leave to File - striken). Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/5/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
April 3, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/3/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2014: # 1 Standing Order - Discovery) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re: 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Mental Examination of Plaintiff Timothy Ray Richardson filed by Fluor Corporation, Fluor Maintenance Services, Inc., Timothy Ray Richardson. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/12/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Fluor Corporation, Fluor Maintenance Services, Inc., Timothy Ray Richardson. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/12/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
June 9, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re 58 Joint Letter Regarding Matter in Dispute Between the Parties Regarding the Rule 35 Mental Examination of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/9/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 12, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 65 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 25, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed on 6/24/2014 by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Granting 67 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
July 21, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 76 Stipulation FOR EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 28, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/28/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
August 11, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/11/21014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Richardson v. Fluor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ray Richardson
Represented By: Douglas Cameron MacLellan
Represented By: Benjamin Elliott Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Maintenance Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]