American Licorice Company v. Total Sweeteners, Inc. et al

Defendant: Total Sweeteners, Inc. and Batory Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: American Licorice Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv01929
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing Re 94 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/15/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
October 22, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 94 Defendant Total Sweeteners' Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
May 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
June 27, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, FRCP12(b)(6). Responses due by 7/8/2013. Replies due by 7/15/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
August 13, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
October 15, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Extending Time for Third-Party Defendants to Respond to Third-Party Complaint) filed by Savannah Sugar Reginery, Imperial Distributing Inc, Imperial Sugar Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
December 9, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 4 ADR Scheduling Order, EXTENDING AND SETTING TIME FOR MEDIATION filed by Savannah Sugar Reginery, Total Sweeteners, Inc., Domino Foods Inc, Imperial Distribu ting Inc, American Licorice Company, Imperial Sugar Company, Harold Peter Smith Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 3/27/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/9/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 10, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Hearings on Motions to Dismiss filed by Domino Foods Inc, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORD ER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Hearings on Motions to Dismiss, 56 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, 51 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Defendant Domino Foods, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiff Batory Foods' Third-Party Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
January 28, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by American Licorice Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
March 4, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 51 56 Third-Party Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Licorice Company v. Total Sweeteners, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Sweeteners, Inc.
Represented By: Kara Berger Persson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batory Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Kara Berger Persson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Licorice Company
Represented By: Lauren Marian Michals
Represented By: Shady Essa Joulani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]