Sumera v. Holder et al

Defendant: David Gaschke, Eric H. Holder, Jr. and Laura Nicolosi
Plaintiff: Ruben Sumera
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01950
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2013 at 5:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on October 4, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 25, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER re 11 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Ruben Sumera. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on October 25, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
November 20, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on November 20, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
December 17, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER re 14 Certificate of Service filed by Ruben Sumera. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on December 17, 2013. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
April 25, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on April 25, 2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
May 20, 2014 35 Featured Case ORDER DISCHARGING 30 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/20/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 30, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING BY JUNE 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/30/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
July 3, 2014 39 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT 27 ; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS 27 . Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/03/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sumera v. Holder et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gaschke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Nicolosi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Sumera
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Represented By: Russell A Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]