Apostol v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al

Defendant: Crystal Moore, CR Title Services, Inc., CITI Residential Lending, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Bryan Bly and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Obed M. Apostol, Jr.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01983
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/24/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
August 2, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STIPULATED BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Opposition/Responses to 19 Motion to Dismiss and 21 Motion to Dismiss due by 8/19/2013. Replies due by 9/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/02/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 28, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Defendants shall file their Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by 09/27/2013. Responses due by 10/21/2013. Replies due by 11/6/2013. Hearing set for 11/20/2013 02:00 PM in Co urtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/28/2013. (Hearings set for 9/25/2013 and 10/22/2013 are vacated.)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
November 21, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The Court GRANTS defendants' motions to dismiss and DISMISSES this case WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/21/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Apostol v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Title Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITI Residential Lending, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Bly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obed M. Apostol, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]