Bell v. Nguyen et al

Defendant: Wise and Chi Nguyen
Plaintiff: Willie Bell, Jr.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01987
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: PSLC ECK
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME re 25 Request filed by Willie Bell, Jr. The opposition shall be filed on or before January 30, 2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/17/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
April 15, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/15/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
May 28, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE AND PARTIAL DISMISSAL; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/24/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bell v. Nguyen et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Nguyen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Bell, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]