Xun v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Hong Jun Xun
Case Number: 4:2013cv02041
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; Reverses and Remands on issue. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 16, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/16/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
May 10, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO INFORM COURT WHETHER THEY CONSENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/10/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xun v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Jun Xun
Represented By: Jimmy S McBirney
Represented By: Lacey Lachelle Bangle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.