St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company et al

Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Lexington Insurance Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Harford, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Nautilus Insurance Company and Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv02047
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2014 137 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Non-Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2015. Disclosure of Experts due by 3/2/2015. Rebuttal due by 5/26/2015. Expert Discovery due by 7/29/2015. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/30/2015. Final Pretrial Con ference set for 2/11/2016 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 3/7/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/2/14. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
March 16, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 142 Stipulation TO DISMISS AMERICAN SAFETY INDEMNITY COMPANY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 143 Stipulation TO DISMISS FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 144 Stipulation TO DISMISS NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 25, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DISMISSING DEFENDANT NATIONAL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY UNDER FRCPRULE 41(A)(2). ( 151 Stipulation Terminated). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
July 8, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/8/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Kimberly Rene Arnal
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Represented By: Alan Edward Swerdlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: James Ronald Tenero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Ronald D. Echeguren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Harford
Represented By: Marsha L. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter Bruce Lightstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Elisabeth Marie DAgostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: James Ronald Tenero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]