Williams v. City of San Leandro et al

Defendant: San Leandro Chief of Police, City of San Leandro and Mund
Plaintiff: Robert Lawrence Williams
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv02302
Filed: May 21, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Referring Judge: PSLC ECK
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANT MUND'S 17 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFF'S 33 MOTION TO ADMIT NEWLY OBTAINED EVIDENCE AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REMAINING ( 15 , 21 , 22 , 24 , 25 , 33 )MOTIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/14/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
October 1, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF FUNDS DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
December 5, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE AND DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams v. City of San Leandro et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Leandro Chief of Police
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Leandro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lawrence Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]