Zysman v. Zanett Inc. et al

Defendant: Kim Edward Elverud, Dennis Harkins, Claudio M. Guazzoni, IT Commonwealth, Zanett Inc. and Sumner Harrington Ltd.
Plaintiff: Maya Zysman
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv02813
Filed: June 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 104 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
July 2, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The parties are ordered to advise the court by July 7, 2014 whether the hearing on the parties' ex parte discovery letters 74 75 should remain scheduled for July 31, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/02/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
September 25, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING; REQUIRING RULE 26 DISCLOSURES; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Early Settlement Conference; Denying Request for Telephonic Appearance. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 1/16/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 10/11/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
January 9, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 49 Ex Parte MOTION to Appear by Telephone and Request an Order Resetting the Status Conference to January 27, 2014 filed by IT Commonwealth, Sumner Harrington Ltd., Kim Edward Elverud, Claudio M. Guazzoni, Dennis Harkins, Zanett Inc. Case Management Conference is reset to 1/27/2014 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 5. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/9/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
February 4, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/04/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 5, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Court will conduct further settlement conference telephonically. The parties must submit confidential letters on or before February 28, 2014.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/5/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 13, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 57 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 21, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Motion Hearing on 59 and 60 set for 3/27/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/21/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 62 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
March 7, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISCOVERY REQUESTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/07/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 31, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 59 and 60 Discovery Letter Briefs.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
April 25, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 69 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Sumner Harrington Ltd., Kim Edward Elverud, Claudio M. Guazzoni, Dennis Harkins, Zanett Inc., 70 Second Discovery Letter Briefresponse filed by Maya Zysman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/25/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zysman v. Zanett Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Edward Elverud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Harkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudio M. Guazzoni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IT Commonwealth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zanett Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumner Harrington Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maya Zysman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]