eBay, Inc. v. Dotcom Retail Limited et al

Plaintiff: eBay, Inc.
Defendant: Dotcom Retail Limited and BeautyBay.Com
Case Number: 4:2013cv02853
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
September 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 Stipulation filed by eBay, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
March 21, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Discovery due by 11/26/2014. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 1/26/2015 09:30 AM before Hon. Samuel Conti. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/21/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
September 5, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 38 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Jury Selection set for 5/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Fra ncisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/05/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 11, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Discovery Procedures by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
October 7, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re the Parties' joint letter 42 by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 16, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting hearing regarding the discovery letter briefs filed on 9/26/14 and 10/9/14 (Dkt. 42 & Dkt. 44) for Tuesday, October 21, 2014 at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94102.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 29, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFIED re 50 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct. Discovery due by 2/20/2015. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 8/3/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/28/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
February 2, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFIED ORDER granting 55 JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 3/23/2015. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/02/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: eBay, Inc. v. Dotcom Retail Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eBay, Inc.
Represented By: James Robert Cady
Represented By: Bobby A. Ghajar
Represented By: Marcus DeWayne Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dotcom Retail Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BeautyBay.Com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.