Amedee v. CitiMortgage, Inc.

Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jon C. Amedee
Case Number: 4:2013cv03040
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken APPROVING 35 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
March 17, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 25 MOTION TO DISMISS, GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
May 22, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/22/2014. (vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
June 17, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/17/2104. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
July 8, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on July 8, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
August 13, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 42 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 43 Motion to Strike (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 13, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/13/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amedee v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Heather S Kim
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Represented By: Andrew An Bao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon C. Amedee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.