Rahman v. Mott's LLP et al

Defendant: Mott's LLP
Plaintiff: Mohammed Rahman
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03482
Filed: July 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Illston's standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
September 17, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER:Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/16/13., Motions terminated: 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 Clerks Notice ; Joint Stipulation to Extend Plaintiff's Time to Reset Date of Initial Case Management Conference filed by Mohammed Rahman. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
October 1, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 22 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 24, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reset Date of Initial Case Management Conference from November 8, 2013, to December 20, 2013 filed by Mohammed Rahman. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/24/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
December 16, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
January 29, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 31 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
March 31, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER 52 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
April 8, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 49 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
June 26, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 45 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Hearings,, STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE BY TWO WEEKS TO ALLOW COMPLETION OF PRE-CERITIFICAT ION DISCOVERY filed by Mohammed Rahman. Motion Hearing re: class certification set for 9/19/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/26/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
August 7, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL 65 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 21, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rahman v. Mott's LLP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mott's LLP
Represented By: Kevin Marshall Sadler
Represented By: Van H. Beckwith
Represented By: Ryan Lee Bangert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Rahman
Represented By: Jordan L. Lurie
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Arvin Ratanavongse
Represented By: Cody Robert Padgett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]