Sierra Club et al v. Regina McCarthy

Defendant: Regina McCarthy
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club
Case Number: 4:2013cv03953
Filed: August 26, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7413
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 109 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
September 3, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 126 GRANTING STATES' MOTION TO FILE AN AMICUS BRIEF AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 30, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS SET FOR OCTOBER 17, 2014 AND CONTINUING OCTOBER 17, 2014 HEARING TO OCTOBER 31, 2014 139 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
October 16, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating 11/7/13 hearing date on 16 and 23 Motions to Intervene. The briefing schedule set forth in Order 37 is still in effect. The Court will schedule a new hearing date on the motions to intervene after the conclusion of the shutdown. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/16/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 30, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Withrawal of Counsel. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/29/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
November 4, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
December 6, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STATES' MOTIONS TO INTERVENE AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 55 68 70 16 23 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
January 15, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON REMEDY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 21, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/14 is continued to 7/25/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/17/14. Motions terminated: 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 76 Clerks Notice to Amend Case Schedule filed by State of North Carolina.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. Regina McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: David S. Baron
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Zachary Max Fabish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Zachary Max Fabish
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: David S. Baron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]