Mitchell et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Christine Mitchell and Robert J. Mitchell
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv04017
Filed: August 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 9 Motion to Remand (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 30, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER Striking as improperly filed 24 Plaintiffs' Rebuttal to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Wells Fargo's Motion and Special Motion to Strike SLAPP Suit, filed by Robert J. Mitchell, Christine Mitchell. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/30/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
November 18, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 18 MOTION to Strike SLAPP Suit Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 425.16; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 10 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint. Defendant's Supplement Brief due 11/25/13. Plaintiffs' Responses due by 12/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/18/13. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
February 24, 2014 52 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Additional Billing Records in support of 48 MOTION for Attorney Fees ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Wells Fargo's Response due by 3/10/2014.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/24/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
April 1, 2014 54 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Well Fargo's 48 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $9,920.00. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Mitchell
Represented By: Ravi Krishna Sakthivel
Represented By: Luis Walters Camacho
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Mitchell
Represented By: Ravi Krishna Sakthivel
Represented By: Luis Walters Camacho
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]