Masterobjects, Inc. v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Masterobjects, Inc.
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv04304
Filed: September 17, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Masterobjects, Inc. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
December 19, 2013 28 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/19/2013 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 12/19/2013). Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2014 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2013) Modified on 12/23/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2013 27 NOTICE of Appearance by George F. Bishop (Bishop, George) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 12, 2013 26 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Google, Inc., Masterobjects, Inc.. (Jones, Darcy) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 6, 2013 25 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Google, Inc.. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 29, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2013)
November 29, 2013 24 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (PRIVATE MEDIATION) by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 21 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2013)
November 27, 2013 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google, Inc.. (Jones, Darcy) (Filed on 11/27/2013) Modified on 11/29/2013 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2013 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. (Jones, Darcy) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Jones, Darcy) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Regarding Defendant Google Inc. (Jones, Darcy) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 20, 2013 19 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey James Toney.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 18 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Darcy L. Jones.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 20, 2013 17 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan K. Waldrop.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 18, 2013 16 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Google, Inc.. (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Google, Inc.. Filed byMasterobjects, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B.1, # 3 Exhibit B.2, # 4 Exhibit C)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey J. Toney ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8164073.) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Toney, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8163779.) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Darcy) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8163534.) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Mitro (Mitro, Keith) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 16, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2013 02:00 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 4, 2013 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Masterobjects, Inc.. Service waived by Google, Inc. waiver sent on 9/19/2013, answer due 11/18/2013. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 1, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 10/1/2013. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/1/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. C 13-4304 DMR AND C 11-1054 PJH ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/1/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 30, 2013 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Masterobjects, Inc... (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 17, 2013 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2013 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Masterobjects, Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt no. 34611089782.). Filed byMasterobjects, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masterobjects, Inc. v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masterobjects, Inc.
Represented By: Diane Sue Rice
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Represented By: Darrell Rae Atkinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]