Goodfellow v. Ahren et al

Defendant: City of Oakland, Alameda County Sheriffs Department, Alameda County, Gregory J. Ahren, Oakland Police Department and Ian Willis
Plaintiff: James F. Goodfellow
Case Number: 4:2013cv04726
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/12/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
March 26, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/26/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
May 12, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING PRIOR ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/12/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 19, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL 47 . Court will hold further discovery hearing and revisit the motion to compel on 6/18/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/19/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 21, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ryu for Settlement. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/21/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
August 7, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER DISCOVERY HEARING. Effective immediately and until further Court order, the Court rescinds any requirement that the parties meet and confer with each other in person or by telephone before presenting any discovery dispute. The parties are to communicate with each other in writing only, concerning discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
September 2, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: EX PARTE COMMUNICATION. Any written request to the Court for an order must be presented by a stipulation or motion filed with the Court. See Civ. L.R.7-1(a). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/2/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 9, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: EX PARTE COMMUNICATION. Any written request to the Court for an order must be presented by a stipulation or motion filed by the Court.. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 11, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 80 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/11/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodfellow v. Ahren et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriffs Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Ahren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. Goodfellow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]