Sebastian v. Allstate Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Connie H. Sebastian
Defendant: Allstate Corporation and Surety Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv04850
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 18 Opposition/Response to Motion and Request for Appointment of Counsel filed by Connie H. Sebastian. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/25/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
December 30, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response or response to motion to dismiss due by 1/10/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. January 7, 2014 hearing date is vacated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/30/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 19 . Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on December 30, 2013. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
January 23, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING SET FOR JANUARY 28, 2014, re 23 Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Surety Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
June 9, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 8 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
September 29, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 30 Motion for Leave to Amend without Prejudice; denying as Moot 31 Motion Leave to File a Supplemental Pleading. Motion filed by 11/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
December 2, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice 37 Motion to for Leave to Amend; Order of reference to Magistrate Judge Ryu for Settlement Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
March 27, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 48 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. There being no operative complaint, the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sebastian v. Allstate Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie H. Sebastian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Eve Freed Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surety Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Giovanna A. Ferrari
Represented By: Jessica Eve Freed Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]