Winding Creek Solar LLC v. California Public Utilities Commission

Plaintiff: Winding Creek Solar LLC
Defendant: California Public Utilities Commission
Case Number: 4:2013cv04934
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
January 6, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR ORDER PERMITTING APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY AT THE JANUARY 23, 2014 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/6/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 28, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
February 10, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
June 11, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 45 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
February 17, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winding Creek Solar LLC v. California Public Utilities Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winding Creek Solar LLC
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Represented By: Michael J Melone
Represented By: Thomas Melone
Represented By: Jaime G. Touchstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Public Utilities Commission
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie McQuillan
Represented By: Harvey Yale Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.