Airwair Internationl Ltd. v. GoJane LLC et al

Defendant: GoJane LLC and Aeropostale, Inc
Plaintiff: Airwair Internationl Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2013cv05289
Filed: November 14, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/9/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
October 8, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Aeropostale, Inc, GoJane LLC, Airwair Internationl Ltd., 28 Proposed Order filed by Airwair Internationl Ltd., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/8/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
February 5, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 8 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference; Extending Deadline for Service of Process (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airwair Internationl Ltd. v. GoJane LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoJane LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeropostale, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airwair Internationl Ltd.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Blazewicz
Represented By: Marcy J. Bergman
Represented By: Haley T Albertine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]